AZ SB1512 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Vulnerable persons; incident notification; inspections

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vulnerable persons; incident notification; inspections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-22HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-08HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0)
2021-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-18SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36569Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
46452.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75609
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1512p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1512s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1512floorrogers.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484488
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484526
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486646
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486844
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487458
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487733
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487941
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75609&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75609&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75609&billStatusActionId=202804&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75609&billStatusActionId=202908&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75609&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75609&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback