AZ SB1512 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Active management areas; sixth management period
Title
Active management areas; sixth management period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Active Management Areas
Conforming Legislation
Conservation
Delayed Repeal
Groundwater
Sixth Management Period
Water
Waters - Title 45
Conforming Legislation
Conservation
Delayed Repeal
Groundwater
Sixth Management Period
Water
Waters - Title 45
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 563 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 563.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 568.05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |