AZ SB1510 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Incompetent persons; mental health evaluations
Title
Incompetent persons; mental health evaluations
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-1-7-0) |
2016-04-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |