AZ SB1509 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County officials; salary
Title
County officials; salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Bond
Compensation
Counties - Title 11
County Officials
County Salaries
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
District Board Members
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elected Officials
Employees
Oath
Payment Of Expenses For Employment Candidates
Prohibition
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Salaries
Compensation
Counties - Title 11
County Officials
County Salaries
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
District Board Members
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elected Officials
Employees
Oath
Payment Of Expenses For Employment Candidates
Prohibition
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Salaries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |