AZ SB1507 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ALTCS; dental services
Title
ALTCS; dental services
Sponsors
Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |