AZ SB1505 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 357
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemption; natural gas delivery
Title
Tax exemption; natural gas delivery
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 357 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-18-5-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-3-0-0-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-8-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-1-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |