AZ SB1500 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 356
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial commission of Arizona; omnibus
Title
Industrial commission of Arizona; omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] |
Sen. David Farnsworth [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] | Sen. Bob Worsley [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 356 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-0-1) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |