AZ SB1497 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Ballot measures; proposition 105; disclosure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot measures; proposition 105; disclosure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateChapter 231
2021-04-14SenateGovernor Signed
2021-04-14SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-04-07SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-04-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2021-04-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-03-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-17HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-03-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-03-10HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-03-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2021-03-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2021-02-16SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-16SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-15SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-02-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-2-0)
2021-02-02SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-01SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75594
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1497p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/sb1497s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/laws/0231.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.1497floorugenti-rita.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483105
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486209
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487077
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487319
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488665
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488875
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488873
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75594&billStatusActionId=201971&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75594&billStatusActionId=202330&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75594&billStatusActionId=202582&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75594&billStatusActionId=203569&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75594&billStatusActionId=203590&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback