AZ SB1497 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Teachers; principals; evaluation instrument

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers; principals; evaluation instrument

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-04-03HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-04-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-19HouseHouse ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-21SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15977Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70708
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1497p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1497s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1497boyer se.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1497education.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70708&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70708&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70708&billStatusActionId=182291&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70708&billStatusActionId=182331&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70708&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70708&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70708&billStatusActionId=183251&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70708&billStatusActionId=183420&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback