AZ SB1495 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Personal data; internet; consent
Title
Personal data; internet; consent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Consent
Information Technology
Information Technology - Title 18
Internet
Parental Consent
Personal Data
Private Right Of Action
Requirements
User Rights
Consent
Information Technology
Information Technology - Title 18
Internet
Parental Consent
Personal Data
Private Right Of Action
Requirements
User Rights