AZ SB1494 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - House read second time
Pending: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of water resources; continuation.
Title
Department of water resources; continuation.
Sponsors
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Sen. Lisa Otondo [D] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.10 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3028.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |