AZ SB1492 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Election law amendments
Title
Election law amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 230 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ballot Replacement Center
Board Of Supervisors
Canvass
City Or Town Clerk
County Recorder
County School Superintendent
Education - Title 15
Election Law Amendments
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Initiative, Referendum And Recall - Title 19
Office Of Precinct Committeman
State Government - Title 41
Board Of Supervisors
Canvass
City Or Town Clerk
County Recorder
County School Superintendent
Education - Title 15
Election Law Amendments
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Initiative, Referendum And Recall - Title 19
Office Of Precinct Committeman
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1442 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 227 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 449 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 558.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 645 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |