AZ SB1487 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chapter 35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State law; local violations; penalties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State law; local violations; penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17 Chapter 35
2016-03-17 Governor Signed
2016-03-17 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-16HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0)
2016-03-16HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-14HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-1-1-0)
2016-03-02HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-03-09HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0)
2016-03-03HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2016-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-03-02HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2016-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2016-02-24SenateTransmit to House
2016-02-24SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2016-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-02SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-03SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-03SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback