AZ SB1486 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-12-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Preplacement protocol; out-of-home placement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preplacement protocol; out-of-home placement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-12-3-0)
2020-03-16SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-02-04SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-03SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8503.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73802
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1486p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1486s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1486farnsworth e0836.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73802&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73802&billStatusActionId=195644&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73802&billStatusActionId=195814&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73802&billStatusActionId=195829&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback