AZ SB1486 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Referred to House ERA Committee
Pending: House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-06 - Referred to House ERA Committee
Pending: House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees; activities; unions; compensation.
Title
Public employees; activities; unions; compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-06 | House read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-28 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |