AZ SB1485 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM with Objections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Unions; public employees; prohibitions
Title
Unions; public employees; prohibitions
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] |
Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] | Rep. Terri Proud [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |