AZ SB1481 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Filing deadlines; taxable year 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Filing deadlines; taxable year 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-11HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-07HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72163
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1481p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1481s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1481mesnard.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1481fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1481floormesnard.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72163&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72163&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72163&billStatusActionId=187960&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72163&billStatusActionId=188068&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72163&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72163&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72163&billStatusActionId=188627&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback