AZ SB1480 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates
Title
Special license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (14-14-2-0) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0) |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-0-0-2-0) |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |