AZ SB1479 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-22 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health services; evaluations
Title
Mental health services; evaluations
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-03-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accompaniment
Mental Health Provider
Mental Health Services
Mental Health Treatment
Patient Transport
Public Health And Safety
Mental Health Provider
Mental Health Services
Mental Health Treatment
Patient Transport
Public Health And Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 540.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |