AZ SB1478 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employer contributions; EORP

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employer contributions; EORP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-2-2-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurs
2018-05-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-03SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading None voting: (57-3-0-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-28HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse BI Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House BI Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-15HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-02-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-02-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-31SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38810Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38848.05New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70681
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1478p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1478s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1478h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0343.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1478livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1478appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70681&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70681&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70681&billStatusActionId=180903&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70681&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70681&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70681&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70681&billStatusActionId=183613&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70681&billStatusActionId=183628&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70681&billStatusActionId=183740&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70681&billStatusActionId=183755&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback