AZ SB1477 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; felonies; clerk; database
Title
Voter registration; felonies; clerk; database
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Rep. John Fillmore [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 251 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-05-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-12-9-0) |
2022-03-29 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-29 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-23 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-4-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-15 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Clerk
Clerk Of The Court
County Recorder
Database
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Felonies
Notice Of Conviction
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Secretary Of State
Voter Registration
Clerk Of The Court
County Recorder
Database
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Felonies
Notice Of Conviction
Qualification Of Electors
Registration Of Electors
Secretary Of State
Voter Registration