AZ SB1477 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gasoline formulations; air quality
Title
Gasoline formulations; air quality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 3493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 3494 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |