AZ SB1477 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Senate majority caucus: Hold
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinsurance; workers compensation
Title
Reinsurance; workers compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Hold |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |