AZ SB1476 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ballot numbering; custody
Title
Ballot numbering; custody
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |