AZ SB1474 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

POW/MIA flag; display

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POW/MIA flag; display

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateChapter 23
2019-03-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-03-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-04HouseHouse MVA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House MVA Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-11SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38449Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72153
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1474p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1474s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0023.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72153&billStatusActionId=186666&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72153&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72153&billStatusActionId=188353&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback