AZ SB1474 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - House read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aquatics facility maintenance districts
Title
Aquatics facility maintenance districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Aquatics Facility Maintenance Districts
Board Election Procedures
Districts
Duties
Procedures
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Board Election Procedures
Districts
Duties
Procedures
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48