AZ SB1474 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Human fetus; embryo; prohibited actions
Title
Human fetus; embryo; prohibited actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Chapter 77 | |
2016-03-30 | Governor Signed | |
2016-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-03-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (41-17-2-0) |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |