AZ SB1472 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-21 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mobile homes; certificates of title
Title
Mobile homes; certificates of title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Application
Certificates Of Title
Mobile Homes
Title And Registration
Transportation - Title 28
Vision Screening
Certificates Of Title
Mobile Homes
Title And Registration
Transportation - Title 28
Vision Screening
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2051.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |