AZ SB1472 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; distribution; education; use tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; distribution; education; use tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-15HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-04HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2019-02-21SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-1-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425029.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72150
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1472p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1472s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1472gowan.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.14721155.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1472approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1472farnsworth e0903.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72150&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72150&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72150&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72150&billStatusActionId=187404&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72150&billStatusActionId=187634&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback