AZ SB1469 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Chapter 284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances monitoring; search warrants
Title
Controlled substances monitoring; search warrants
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 284 |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-0-14-0) |
2022-03-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-03-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Controlled Substances Monitoring
Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Search Warrants
Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Search Warrants