AZ SB1469 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forensic evidence testing; postconviction relief
Title
Forensic evidence testing; postconviction relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 157 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House CJR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to House CJR Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Advamced Forensic Testing
Advanced Forensic Testing (h)
Convicted Felons
Criminal Code - Title 13
Forensic Evidence Testing
Postconviction (h)
Postconviction Relief
Relief (h)
Request
Advanced Forensic Testing (h)
Convicted Felons
Criminal Code - Title 13
Forensic Evidence Testing
Postconviction (h)
Postconviction Relief
Relief (h)
Request