AZ SB1469 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agency consolidation; department of insurance
Title
Agency consolidation; department of insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 252 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-2-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agency Consolidation
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Insurance
Labor - Title 23
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Banks And Financial Institutions - Title 6
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
Counties - Title 11
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Insurance
Labor - Title 23
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Trusts, Estates And Protective Proceedings - Title 14
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 2251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 483 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 3603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 5411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 124 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1593 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 1361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1391.16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 4301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 1210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3020.17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3022.17 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3024.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 300.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 111 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 123.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 135.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 991.12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 991.15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 991.16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 991.21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |