AZ SB1467 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; drug treatment; testing; reporting
Title
AHCCCS; drug treatment; testing; reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs (see Also: Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System)
Annual Report
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Conditional Enactment
Dna-matched Drug Testing
Drug Treatment
Notice
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Recovery Support And Accountability Program
Reporting
Requirements
Testing
Annual Report
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System (ahcccs)
Conditional Enactment
Dna-matched Drug Testing
Drug Treatment
Notice
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Recovery Support And Accountability Program
Reporting
Requirements
Testing