AZ SB1466 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; adult-use marijuana
Title
Medical marijuana; adult-use marijuana
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2023-05-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-05-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adult-use Marijuana
Advertising
Arizona Biomedical Research Centre
Civil Penalty
Definitions
Denial
Disposition Of Monies
Early Applicants
Exemption
Fees
Fund Transfers
Grants
Labeling
Legal Counsel
Legislative Intent
Licensing
Marijuana
Marijuana Clinical Trials
Marijuana Products
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Notice
Packaging
Private Donations
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registry Identification Card
Repeal
Requirements
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Restrictions
Retail Classification
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment) (h)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum)
Rulemaking
Rulemaking Exemption
Rules
Smart And Safe Arizona Fund
Taxation - Title 42
Testing
Three-fourths Vote
Use Of Monies
Advertising
Arizona Biomedical Research Centre
Civil Penalty
Definitions
Denial
Disposition Of Monies
Early Applicants
Exemption
Fees
Fund Transfers
Grants
Labeling
Legal Counsel
Legislative Intent
Licensing
Marijuana
Marijuana Clinical Trials
Marijuana Products
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Notice
Packaging
Private Donations
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Registry Identification Card
Repeal
Requirements
Requirements For Enactment
Requirements For Enactment (rfe)
Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum (rfeir)
Requirements For Enactment; Three-fourths Vote
Restrictions
Retail Classification
Rfe (see Also: Requirements For Enactment) (h)
Rfeir (see Also: Requirements For Enactment, Initiative Or Referendum)
Rulemaking
Rulemaking Exemption
Rules
Smart And Safe Arizona Fund
Taxation - Title 42
Testing
Three-fourths Vote
Use Of Monies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 2801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2801.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2806.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2817 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2854.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2856 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |