AZ SB1466 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pupils with chronic health conditions
Title
Pupils with chronic health conditions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | House ED Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-21 | House | House read second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2022-02-24 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Chronic Health Conditions
Education - Title 15
Pupils
School District Governing Board
School Districts (h)
Education - Title 15
Pupils
School District Governing Board
School Districts (h)