AZ SB1466 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Conference Committee recommended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Voting centers; board of supervisors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting centers; board of supervisors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Representative Clark to exclude the Mesnard flr amendment (Y: 25 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-19HouseHouse third reading None voting: (34-24-2-0)
2018-04-19HouseHouse motion to amend
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-22HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-12HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-08HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-03-07SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-06SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16411.01New CodeSee Bill Text
16542Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16584Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70672
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1466p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1466s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1466h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.14661011.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1466jud.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1466gray1025.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70672&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70672&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70672&billStatusActionId=182338&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70672&billStatusActionId=182360&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70672&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70672&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70672&billStatusActionId=183352&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70672&billStatusActionId=183353&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70672&billStatusActionId=183354&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback