AZ SB1462 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2406
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; child care services
Title
Appropriation; child care services
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Chapter 18 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-1-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Replaces) 2021-02-04 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Child Care Services
Department Of Economic Security
Supplemental Appropriation
Appropriation
Appropriations (h)
Child Care Services
Department Of Economic Security
Supplemental Appropriation