AZ SB1457 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-06 - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility; empowerment scholarships; health insurance
Title
Eligibility; empowerment scholarships; health insurance
Sponsors
Sen. David Bradley [D] | Sen. Carlyle Begay [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 24 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 24 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Chapter 112 | |
2016-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-05-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |