AZ SB1454 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Veteran suicide prevention; pilot program
Title
Veteran suicide prevention; pilot program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Chapter 199 |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-06-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2023-06-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-06-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-06-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-06-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-27 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (14-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-03-22 | House | House read second time |
2023-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-03-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-4-2-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Advs (see Also: Department Of Veterans' Services)
Amusements And Sports - Title 5 (h)
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Arizona Veterans Memorial State Park (h)
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Veterans' Services (advs)
Exemption
Pilot Program
State Government - Title 41
Veteran Suicide Prevention
Veteran Suicide Prevention Training Pilot Program
Amusements And Sports - Title 5 (h)
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Arizona Veterans Memorial State Park (h)
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Veterans' Services (advs)
Exemption
Pilot Program
State Government - Title 41
Veteran Suicide Prevention
Veteran Suicide Prevention Training Pilot Program
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 610.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |