AZ SB1453 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Affordable homeownership special plate
Title
Affordable homeownership special plate
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Rios [D] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. David Bradley [D] | Rep. Lupe Contreras [D] |
Sen. Sally Gonzales [D] | Sen. Victoria Steele [D] | Rep. Richard Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 161 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-22-1-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2463 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 6993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |