AZ SB1452 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - House third reading FAILED voting: (18-42-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - House third reading FAILED voting: (18-42-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homeowners' associations; condominiums; director removal
Title
Homeowners' associations; condominiums; director removal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (18-42-0-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |