AZ SB1451 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Procedures; nomination petitions; registered circulators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedures; nomination petitions; registered circulators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Motion Should the ruling of the Chair be overturned: "to not sustain the point of order" (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07SenateChapter 315
2019-06-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-05-24SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-10-4-0)
2019-05-24SenateSenate Conference adopted
2019-05-23HouseHouse Conference adopted
2019-05-23HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2019-05-22SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2019-05-21HouseHouse Minority report
2019-05-21SenateSenate Minority report
2019-05-21SenateSenate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
2019-05-20HouseHouse Conference members: TOWNSEND, CARROLL, SALMAN
2019-05-20HouseHouse Conference appointed
2019-05-20SenateSenate Conference members: LEACH, GOWAN, QUEZADA
2019-05-20SenateSenate Conference appointed
2019-05-15SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-05-15SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-08HouseHouse miscellaneous motion: Should the ruling of the Chair be overturned: "to not sustain the point of order", voting: (29-31-0-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-19HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-03-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-03-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19121.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
19125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72111
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1451p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1451s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1451h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1451c.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0315.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1451leach0444.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/54leg/1r/s.14511120.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72111&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72111&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=187606&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=187938&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72111&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72111&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=188776&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=189475&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=189479&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=189480&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=189785&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72111&billStatusActionId=189806&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback