AZ SB1451 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Patient referral inducements; prohibited compensation
Title
Patient referral inducements; prohibited compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] |
Sen. Katie Hobbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chapter 223 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |