AZ SB1450 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Independent oversight committees; appointment; duties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent oversight committees; appointment; duties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenateChapter 257
2018-04-17SenateGovernor Signed
2018-04-11SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-11SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-04-11SenateSenate concurs
2018-04-10SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-04-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-16SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36553Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
413804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8807Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70647
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1450p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1450s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1450h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0257.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.1450barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1450floorbarto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.1450farnsworth e.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.1450judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70647&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70647&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=182118&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=182200&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=182283&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70647&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70647&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=183112&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=183163&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=183208&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70647&billStatusActionId=183262&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback