AZ SB1448 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alarm systems; low-voltage electric fences

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alarm systems; low-voltage electric fences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateChapter 67
2019-04-10SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-04SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (43-17-0-0)
2019-03-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-18HouseHouse RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RA Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-21HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2019-02-19SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-18SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-02-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-05SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32108New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72107
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1448p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1448s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0067.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72107&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72107&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72107&billStatusActionId=186665&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72107&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72107&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72107&billStatusActionId=188768&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback