AZ SB1445 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Suicide prevention training; school employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suicide prevention training; school employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-05SenateChapter 82
2020-06-05SenateGovernor Signed
2020-05-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-05-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-05-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0)
2020-05-19HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-03-09HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-05HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2020-03-04HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-25HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2020-02-18SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-11SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2020-02-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151656Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73737
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1445p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1445s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0082.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73737&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73737&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73737&billStatusActionId=193742&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73737&billStatusActionId=194123&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73737&billStatusActionId=194140&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73737&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73737&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73737&billStatusActionId=196289&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73737&billStatusActionId=196312&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback