AZ SB1444 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; excused absences; mental health
Title
Schools; excused absences; mental health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Behavioral Health
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Excused Absences
Mental Health
School Attendance
Schools
Department Of Education
Education - Title 15
Excused Absences
Mental Health
School Attendance
Schools