AZ SB1444 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-8-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State lake improvement fund; counties
Title
State lake improvement fund; counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Government Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | House GOV Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-8-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Counties
Lake Improvement Fund
State Government - Title 41
State Lake Improvement Fund
Counties
Lake Improvement Fund
State Government - Title 41
State Lake Improvement Fund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 511.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 511.25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |