AZ SB1444 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; American civics education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; American civics education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateChapter 289
2018-05-15SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-05-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-7-1-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-05-02HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-03-21HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse read second time
2018-03-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2018-03-08HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-03-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-02-22SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-22SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-20SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0)
2018-02-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-01-31SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15701.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70641
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1444p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1444s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0289.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.14440310.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1444ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1444yee0759.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70641&billStatusActionId=181772&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70641&billStatusActionId=182196&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70641&billStatusActionId=182281&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70641&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70641&billStatusActionId=183612&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70641&billStatusActionId=183617&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback