AZ SB1442 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Horse racing; geofencing; wagering; licensing
Title
Horse racing; geofencing; wagering; licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Additional Wagering Facility
Advance Deposit Wagering
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Fee
Geofencing
Horse Racing
Licensing
Licensure
Provider
Racetrack Enclosures
Wagering
Advance Deposit Wagering
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Fee
Geofencing
Horse Racing
Licensing
Licensure
Provider
Racetrack Enclosures
Wagering
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 120 | New Code | See Bill Text |